Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Francisco Cardinal Marco y Catalán

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1771Born
15 Dec 182857.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 182857.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
16 Mar 184169.3DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Marco y Catalán (VIAF: 2374092)
Juan Francisco Cardinal Marco y Catalán (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBello, Italy

  • a cardinal for 12.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018