Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1216¹AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
14 Aug 1216Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
1231¹AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
20 Jul 1231InstalledArchbishop of Rouen, France
10 Jan 1235DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurice
Archbishop Maurice (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a bishop for 18.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 425, and Page 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast