Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Mauny

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jun 1545AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
9 Sep 1545Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
13 Sep 1553AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
1558²DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Mauny
Archbishop François de Mauny (died 1558) Archbishop of Bordeaux

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140, and Page 142
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Oct 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018