Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orazio Cardinal Mattei

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621²Born
17 Jun 167554.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
2 Sep 168665.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168665.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
18 Jan 168867.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Mattei (VIAF: 89112475)
Orazio Cardinal Mattei (born 1621, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018