Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Emilien Massé, P.M.E. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lintong [Lintung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1901Born
1925²23.4ProfessedMember of Société des Missions-Étrangères
29 Jun 192927.9Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
31 Mar 193937.7AppointedPrefect of Lintong [Lintung], China
29 Jul 194342.0DiedPrefect of Lintong [Lintung], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emilien Massé
Father Emilien Massé P.M.E. (born , died ) Prefect of Lintong [Lintung]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoliette, Diocese of Joliette, Québec, Canada
Death PlaceSzepingkai

  • a priest for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast