Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro de Masovia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trento


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1423AppointedBishop of Trento, Italy
29 Sep 1425Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
2 Jun 1444DiedBishop Emeritus of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro de Masovia:
Bishop Alessandro de Masovia (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trento

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 498
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,700
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013