Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín Martínez de Villar

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Oct 1569AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
3 Mar 1573AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Barcelona, Spain
14 Dec 1575DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín Martínez de Villar:
Archbishop Martín Martínez de Villar (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,085

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013