Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Marazzani Visconti

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1755BornPiacenza, Italy
2 Oct 182671.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Dec 182873.3Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 182973.5DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Marazzani Visconti:
Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Marazzani Visconti (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 2.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015