Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joćo Martins de Soalhćes

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1250¹Born
18 Jan 129444.0AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
8 Oct 131363.7AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
1 May 132575.3DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Martins de Soalhćes
Archbishop Joćo Martins de Soalhćes (born 1250, died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoalhćes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 144, and Page 506
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 2 Mar 2019

Quantcast