Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Michele Alfredo Marra, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1921Born
8 Jul 194524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 May 196948.2SelectedApostolic Administrator of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
15 Oct 197958.6ConfirmedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
16 Nov 199271.7RetiredAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
28 Sep 200079.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Alfredo Marra
Abbot Michele Alfredo Marra O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlacanica

  • a priest for 55.2 years

Source(s):
  • r: CB, 17 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast