Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marzio de Marzi Medici

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1511Born
4 Feb 154129.2AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
1573²61.1ResignedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
2 Nov 157462.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marzio de Marzi Medici
Bishop Marzio de Marzi Medici (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo

EventPlace
Death PlaceChirignango

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1541, Number 7*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018