Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Marini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1794BornRome, Italy
21 Dec 184652.2Elevated to Cardinal
12 Apr 184752.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
19 Aug 186368.8DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Pietro Marini:
Pietro Cardinal Marini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 16.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015