Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolò Cardinal Marini

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1843Born
26 Jun 186622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
4 Dec 191673.2Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 191673.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
29 Nov 191774.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
192278.3RetiredSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
7 Jul 192379.8DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

MicroData Summary
Nicolò Marini
Nicolò Cardinal Marini
(born , died )
Secretary Emeritus of Oriental Churches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.5 years

External Link(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 10 May 2025