Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Marienau

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Sep 1416AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
10 Jan 1417Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
7 Mar 1457DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Marienau
Bishop Jan Marienau (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018