Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnau Marí de Santacília

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1379Born
21 Oct 146081.5AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
13 Apr 146485.0DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Arnau Marí de Santacília
Bishop Arnau Marí de Santacília (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460, Number 50*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast