Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Mariani

Deceased

President of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1863BornPosta, Italy
18 Dec 188623.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 193572.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
16 Dec 193572.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Dec 193572.7AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
23 Apr 193976.0DiedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Domenico Mariani:
Domenico Cardinal Mariani (born , died ) President of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015