Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Marescotti

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1625Born
2 Feb 166438.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 166438.7AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
8 Dec 168156.6DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Marescotti
Bishop Marco Antonio Marescotti (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienne

  • a priest for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast