Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Giuseppe Ramiro Marcone, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Montevergine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1882BornSan Pietro Infine
30 Nov 189816.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jul 190624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Mar 191835.9AppointedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
10 Jul 195270.3DiedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ramiro Marcone
Abbot Giuseppe Ramiro Marcone O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Montevergine

  • a priest for 45.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • d: CB, 7 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Jun 2016