Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Mantica

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1534BornVenzone, Italy
5 Jun 159662.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159662.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
24 Jan 159762.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Tommaso in Parione
17 Jun 160268.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
28 Jan 161479.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

MicroData Summary for Francesco Mantica:
Cardinal Francesco Mantica (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

  • a cardinal for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013