Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Manso, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1624ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Dec 1656SelectedBishop of Nicaragua
29 Apr 1658ConfirmedBishop of Nicaragua
1659DiedBishop of Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Tomás Manso:
Bishop Tomás Manso O.F.M. (died 1659) Bishop of Nicaragua

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 189, Number 1,188
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 258
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015