Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carlo von Mansfeld, M.I. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Order of the Ministers of the Sick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1889Born
191222.2ProfessedMember of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
28 Feb 192030.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
194757.2AppointedSuperior General of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
196575.2ResignedSuperior General of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
8 Dec 197283.2DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Order of the Ministers of the Sick

MicroData Summary for Carlo von Mansfeld
Father Carlo von Mansfeld M.I. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Order of the Ministers of the Sick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBochum

  • a priest for 52.7 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018