Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Manola

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1656³BornSplit
18 Mar 167922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Apr 168023.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 170953.1AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
25 Sep 171256.4DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Manola:
Bishop Giovanni Manola (born , died ) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a priest for 32.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 292
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015