Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Mantica

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1727Born
23 Feb 180173.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
23 Feb 180173.4Elevated to Cardinal
13 Apr 180274.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

MicroData Summary for Francesco Mantica
Francesco Cardinal Mantica (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRome, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018