Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iñigo Manrique de Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1484AppointedBishop of León, Spain
26 Aug 1485AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
1 Mar 1496DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Iñigo Manrique de Lara
Bishop Iñigo Manrique de Lara (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 136, and Page 174
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Dec 2018

Quantcast