Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Mancusi

Deceased

Bishop of Acerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1754BornGiffoni
20 Dec 177723.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179742.9SelectedBishop of Acerno, Italy
18 Dec 179743.0ConfirmedBishop of Acerno, Italy
1807¹52.0DiedBishop of Acerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mancusi
Bishop Giuseppe Mancusi (born , died 1807) Bishop of Acerno

  • a priest for 29.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 63
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016