Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Mancini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606Born
5 Apr 166054.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 166054.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
14 May 167064.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
29 Jun 167266.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Mancini
Francesco Maria Cardinal Mancini (born 1606, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1660

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast