Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Maltitz

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491Born
152029.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 153443.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
13 Oct 153746.7SucceededBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
28 Nov 153746.9ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
10 Feb 153847.1Ordained BishopBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
30 Nov 154958.9DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Maltitz (VIAF: 42630072)
Bishop Johann von Maltitz (born 1491, died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMeissen, Diocese of Meißen (Meissen)
Death PlaceMeissen, Diocese of Meißen (Meissen)

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 4
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,541

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Apr 2018