Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Mallevaud, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Clermont

Titular Bishop of Aulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornBellicen
7 Jul 164840.5SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Clermont, France
7 Dec 164840.9ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Clermont, France
7 Dec 164840.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
4 May 168274.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Clermont, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Mallevaud:
Bishop Jean de Mallevaud O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Clermont

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013