Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pandolfe de Malatesta

Deceased

Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras)


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Oct 1418AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
7 Feb 1420Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
10 May 1424AppointedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece

MicroData Summary for Pandolfe de Malatesta:
Archbishop Pandolfe de Malatesta , Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,120
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,205
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 205, and Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Aug 2014