Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Youssef Makhlouf el-Douaihy el-Ehdeni

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)

Bishop of Eden (Maronite)

Note/Previous Titular See: (from arch/Ehdenen)


Events

DateEventTitle
1603²Ordained BishopBishop of Eden (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Nov 1608SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
16 Dec 1634DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youssef Makhlouf el-Douaihy el-Ehdeni:
Patriarch Youssef Makhlouf el-Douaihy el-Ehdeni (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 86
  • b/ob/c2: CB, 26 Apr 2014
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 12,969
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Aug 2014