Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Imre Majthényi Kesselökö

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Esbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1694BornSzeniczien
4 Mar 171924.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 174147.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus

MicroData Summary for Adam Imre Majthényi Kesselökö:
Bishop Adam Imre Majthényi Kesselökö (born ) Titular Bishop of Esbus

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 210
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015