Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Mair, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

Titular Bishop of Salona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1485BornLehr
150217.0ProfessedMember of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
152136.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
8 Jun 152338.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freising, Germany
8 Jun 152338.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
13 Dec 152338.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salona
Mar 152742.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
Oct 153651.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
25 Nov 154358.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Augustin Mair:
Bishop Augustin Mair C.R.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

  • a priest for 22.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013