Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Maidalchini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1621BornViterbo, Italy
7 Oct 164726.5Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 164726.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
5 May 165332.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Pancrazio
23 Mar 165432.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
26 Jun 166241.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
11 Oct 166645.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
168967.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Oct 168968.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
23 Jul 169170.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
13 Jun 170079.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maidalchini:
Cardinal Francesco Maidalchini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

  • a priest for 11.4 years
  • a cardinal for 52.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1647

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013