Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Mai

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1782BornSchilpario, Italy
180825.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 183755.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
12 Feb 183855.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Feb 183855.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
11 Mar 184361.0AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
184865.8ResignedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
185168.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
27 Jun 185371.3AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
9 Sep 185472.5DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Angelo Mai:
Cardinal Angelo Mai (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a cardinal for 17.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013