Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antoine Simon de Magny

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1653Born
16 Aug 170451.6SelectedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
9 Feb 170552.0ConfirmedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
26 Feb 170552.1DiedBishop-Elect of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Simon de Magny
Father Antoine Simon de Magny (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarnoten

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 296
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast