Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo del Mastro (de Magistris), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1631BornNapoli
28 Feb 165423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Mar 169261.2AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
Jun 170574.4DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo del Mastro (de Magistris):
Bishop Vincenzo del Mastro (de Magistris) O.P. Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a priest for 51.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013