Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ronan Maginn (Ghineus)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Dromore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629²Born
27 Mar 166031.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dromore, Ireland
4 Apr 166031.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dromore, Ireland
30 Jun 167142.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dromore, Ireland
6 Nov 1680³51.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Dromore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ronan Maginn (Ghineus)
Father Ronan Maginn (Ghineus) (born 1629, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Dromore

  • a priest for 20.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 177
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast