Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Martínez, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osma

Note/Previous Titular See: (Nicolás de Madrid)


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Nov 1654AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
1655²Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
21 Jun 1660AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
1 Oct 1660DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Martínez:
Bishop Nicolás Martínez O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 99, and Page 268
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 185, Number 1,154
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015