Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João da Madre de Deus Araújo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹Born
13 Feb 168261.1SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
4 May 168261.3ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
13 Sep 168261.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
13 Jun 168665.4DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João da Madre de Deus Araújo
Archbishop João da Madre de Deus Araújo O.F.M. (born 1621, died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,682, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast