Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodor Machciński

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1681³Born
5 Dec 170625.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Dec 170625.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 173048.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodor Machciński
Bishop Teodor Machciński (born ) Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Asia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePozdowicz

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 303
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018