Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William Cecil McGrath (MacGrath), S.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Lishui [Lishui]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1896BornOderin, Canada
192124.7ProfessedMember of Scarboro Foreign Mission Society
29 Jun 192125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Scarboro Foreign Mission Society
4 Mar 193235.8AppointedPrefect of Lishui [Lishui], China
194144.7ResignedPrefect of Lishui [Lishui], China
13 Jul 197074.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Lishui [Lishui], China

MicroData Summary for William Cecil McGrath (MacGrath):
Priest William Cecil McGrath (MacGrath) S.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Lishui [Lishui]

  • a priest for 49.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013