Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmund MacGauran (Magauran)

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548Born
11 Sep 158133.6AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
1 Jul 158739.5AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
15 Feb 159446.1DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Edmund MacGauran (Magauran)
Archbishop Edmund MacGauran (Magauran) (born 1548, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCounty Cavan

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118, and Page 116
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast