Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick MacDonagh

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1678²Born
26 Jul 173961.5SelectedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
14 Aug 173961.6ConfirmedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
7 Mar 175274.1DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick MacDonagh
Bishop Patrick MacDonagh (born 1678, died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilfenora in Co. Clare

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 252
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 53
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast