Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Macchi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1832BornViterbo, Italy
1859²26.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 188956.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 188956.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
30 Nov 189664.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
29 Mar 1907³75.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Macchi:
Cardinal Luigi Macchi (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a cardinal for 18.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54, and Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Feb 1889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013