Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William de Lynn

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
16 May 1362AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
11 Oct 1368AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
18 Nov 1373DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William de Lynn:
Bishop William de Lynn (died ) Bishop of Worcester

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529, and Page 187
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 58
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 242
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013