Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johannes von Lupfen

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1487Born
3 Feb 153244.9SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
16 Dec 153346.8ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
27 Jun 153750.3ResignedBishop-Elect of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
8 May 155164.2DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes von Lupfen
Father Johannes von Lupfen (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Konstanz {Constance}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStühlingen

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018