Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Lugo y de Quiroga, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

Member of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1583BornMadrid, Spain
161834.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
13 Jul 164359.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
14 Dec 164360.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 May 164460.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
17 Oct 164460.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
20 Aug 166076.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

MicroData Summary for Juan de Lugo y de Quiroga:
Cardinal Juan de Lugo y de Quiroga S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

  • a cardinal for 17.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013