Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Lugari

Deceased

Priest of Roma {Rome}

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1846BornRoma
15 Jan 189649.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
27 Nov 191165.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Nov 191165.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
31 Jul 191468.4DiedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Lugari:
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Lugari (born , died ) Priest of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014