Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marko Lučić

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1689³BornSestanec
21 May 171222.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
17 Jul 171223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
24 Sep 173142.2AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
9 Mar 174656.7AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
7 Jul 174960.0DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Marko Lučić:
Archbishop Marko Lučić (born , died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

  • a priest for 36.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86, and Page 349
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015