Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Saturnino de La Torre Merino, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1852Born
1871²18.0ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1876²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
25 Jul 188431.6AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China
189643.0ResignedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China
27 Mar 191663.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Saturnino de La Torre Merino
Father Saturnino de La Torre Merino O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Hunan {Hu-Nan Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastrejón, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Death PlaceGracia, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain

  • a priest for 40.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast